Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Spring Valley Village Of, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Nugent, Brian D, against Afscme Afl-Cio, Civil Service Employees Association Inc Local 1000, Robert Nesi, Spring Valley Unit Rockland County Local 844, Victor Reyes, (total of 5) See All represented by Charny, Nathaniel Kires, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Thomas P Zugibe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas P Zugibe Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time126 days |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: December 30, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: May 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) No fee Authorization Letter |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
April 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Closed
Judge: Zugibe, Hon. Thomas P. |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | |
March 11, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Zugibe, Hon. Thomas P. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.