Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Warshaw, David Barry, against Chana Frydman, represented by Harrison, Joseph Isaac, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: January 30, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 27, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Disclosure Demands |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.