Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ana Gonzalez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Neimark, Marshall Adam, against Bedjinald Presume, represented by Mazzaro, Thomas Robert, Victor, Sabrina Assayag, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: January 27, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2021 | Hearing |
10:10 am ptc virtual
Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
January 06, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned 10:10 am ptc virtual Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS WITH CERT OF MAILING - ROSE PRESUME |
|
July 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Held 10:30am PC virtual Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
June 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled 10:50am PC virtual Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
June 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled 10:50am PC virtual Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Honorable JSC Robert M. Berliner |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Honorable JSC Robert M. Berliner |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.