Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gabriel A Tenemasa Ontaneda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Martin, Matthew Warren, against Anne Coffey, Edward P Coffey, represented by Schoenberg, Richard B, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Sherri L Eisenpress presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSherri L Eisenpress Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 22, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 29, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
September 28, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 08, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
June 29, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 29, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 14, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 31, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 31, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 29, 2021 | Answer and Demands | ||
October 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.