Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gab Management Corp., Wald Realty Co. #2, Llc, filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Lynch, Dennis E, against At&T Mobility, Cingular Wireless, Pcs, Llc, New York Smsa Limited Partnership, represented by Poccia, Angela Marie, Warner, Jarett Lawrence, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Construction Work) |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConstruction |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: December 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Discontinuance |
||
February 08, 2023 |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice against AT&T Mobility and New Cingular Wireless PCS, LL Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice against AT&T Mobility and New Cingular Wireless PCS, LL ... show more |
||
March 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 17, 2021 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
October 13, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 21, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.