Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Credit Corp Solutions Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Amanda Hackshaw, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 21, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: October 21, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
January 13, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
October 21, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
October 18, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 21, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 21, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.