Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Crown Asset Management Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Reji Thomas, represented by Ward, Aubrey, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: May 23, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action |
||
May 23, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT |
||
October 27, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
October 21, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
October 18, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 21, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
September 21, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.