Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dolores Manning, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lazarus, Ellen D, Phillips, Frank J, against John M. Bonkoski, Michael J. Yorke, represented by Ellsworth, Richard M., in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Gerald E Loehr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald E Loehr Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions316 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time316 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: November 10, 2016NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: March 24, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: October 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
November 30, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 30, 2021 | ||
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003) ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #003) Denied for the reasons stated in the affirmation in opposition to this motion. |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) JUDGEMENT |
|
October 31, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003) Gerald E. Loehr Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
October 31, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) Gerald E. Loehr Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | |
October 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003) Gerald E. Loehr Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.