Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Langlois, Christopher P, against Leone Souverain, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Case Cycle Time1190 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 06, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2019 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
March 30, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Driving Abstract as proof of current address |
||
January 20, 2016 | CERTIFIED ABSTRACT OF DRIVING RECORD (DMV) | ||
January 20, 2016 | 202.27-B MAILING RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE | ||
January 07, 2016 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
January 06, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 06, 2016 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LEONE SOUVERAIN |
||
December 29, 2015 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.