Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fourtner, Tracy Mckay, Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Goldberg, Brian David, Polowy, Amy E., Puscheck, Kathleen Elizabeth, (total of 6) See All against Donna Defilippis Est Of, Joan Defilippis Est Of, Kenneth Koehler, Marisa Koehler, Nys People Of, (total of 7) See All represented by Gura, John E., Lauterbach, Richard Spencer, Whidbee-Jordan, Venita Denise, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Paul I Marx presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul I Marx Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2022 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
July 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Answer and Notices of Appearance |
||
July 25, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 25, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
July 25, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Reply |
||
July 25, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
July 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency |
||
July 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Notice of Pendency |
||
July 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Stipulation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.