Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jeffrey Thomas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Babat, Eric M, against Nelson Vivar-Campoverde, Noe Maisonnueve, represented by Meny, Laura L, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Linda Christopher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLinda Christopher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2015 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time224 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2016AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 20, 2016ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 28, 2016NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 25, 2016RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 11, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 13, 2016ANSWER
Date: January 11, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 24, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 24, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 13, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 20, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Hon. Linda Christopher CC (9:15 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Christopher, Hon. Linda |
|
June 13, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 13, 2016 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
March 28, 2016 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 28, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Margaret Garvey PLC (9:15 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Garvey, Hon. Margaret |
|
March 25, 2016 | NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 25, 2016 | ||
January 20, 2016 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
January 20, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 11, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 11, 2016 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.