Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Agata Digiovanni Tominac, Michael Tominac, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pirrotti, Jr, Anthony, against Leticia Medina, Nikia F. Evans, Robert Medina, represented by Cheema, Rafaqat E., Scahill, Francis J, Schioppi, Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Paul I. Marx presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul I. Marx Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2015 |
CategoryTort-Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 12, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 28, 2019ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: March 19, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 03, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 06, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 01, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 01, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 01, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 07, 2017NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 27, 2017NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 12, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 23, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 17, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 31, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 27, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 14, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 27, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 25, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 01, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 06, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 06, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 01, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 01, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | |
February 05, 2020 | Hearing |
Discontinued disc filed 02-03-2020 Judge: Marx, Hon. Paul I. |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
December 02, 2019 | Hearing |
Settled PTC(9:30AM), PIM S CASE (Conversion) Judge: Part - (Rockland), Trial Assignment |
|
September 11, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned Trial Assignment Part PTC(9:30AM), PIM S CASE (Conversion) Judge: Part - (Rockland), Trial Assignment |
|
July 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned Trial Assignment Part PTC(9:30AM), PIM S CASE (Conversion) Judge: Part - (Rockland), Trial Assignment |
|
June 05, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned Trial Assignment Part PTC(9:30AM), PIM S CASE (Conversion) Judge: Part - (Rockland), Trial Assignment |
|
April 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned Trial Assignment Part PTC(9:30AM), PIM S CASE (Conversion) Judge: Part - (Rockland), Trial Assignment |
|
April 10, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned Trial Assignment Part PTC(9:30AM), PIM S CASE (Conversion) Judge: Part - (Rockland), Trial Assignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.