Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Joseph Gonzalez, filed a(n) Torts - Other Negligence (Products Liability) case represented by Levine, Jared T, against Mavis Discount Tire, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Rolf Thorsen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRolf Thorsen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Products Liability) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
|
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 03, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 03, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 03, 2021PETITION
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 20, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 09, 2021CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: September 21, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: February 07, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 15, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 08, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 16, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Decision/Order with Notice of Entry and Affidavits of Service |
||
February 15, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 07, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 21, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 21, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY | ||
September 20, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 20, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 09, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
September 03, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.