Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Altshuler, Aleksandr, Migliaccio, Anthony J, against Joel Brody, Tuff Supplies Corp, represented by Levenson, Scott Craig, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip of Disc with Prejudice and for withdrawal of Def's Motion to Compel Arbitration |
||
March 29, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
March 18, 2022 |
NOTICE OF REJECTION (Motion #001) Opposition is 6 days late after a 1 month extension and over 50 Days to Oppose |
||
March 17, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Affirmation in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration |
||
March 17, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Ex. A - Demand for Arbitration & AAA Filing Confirmation Receipt |
||
February 18, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 15, 2022 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Stipulation of Adjournment of Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration |
||
January 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Amex Credit Card Agreement |
||
January 21, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 21, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.