Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ismanie L Exile, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Sobo, Gregory Marc, against Ag-Oe 100 Corporate Drive Owner,Llc, Jetro Cash And Carry Enterprise,Llc, Jrd Unico, Inc, Rd America,Llc, Restaurant Depot, Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Placke, David Ryan, Schneider, Michael R, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Rolf Thorsen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRolf Thorsen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Slip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 24, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 06, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 19, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 06, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 28, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 24, 2021 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer |
||
November 24, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Medicare/Medicaid Information |
||
November 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 24, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars |
||
November 24, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands to all parties |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.