Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Solomon Silberstein, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Twersky, Aaron, against Anthony Sosnick, Sfld Investments Llc, Sfld Investments, Llc, represented by Cahill, John P., in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas P Zugibe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas P Zugibe Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Declaratory Judgment) |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice |
||
March 10, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
March 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Supplemental Summons and Amended Complaint |
||
February 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - Royalty Agreement |
||
February 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B - First Michigan Action |
||
February 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Exhibit E - Email |
||
February 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C - Settlement Agreement |
||
February 18, 2022 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant' Motion to Dismiss |
||
February 18, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Aaron Twersky in Opposition to Defendant' Motion to Dismiss |
||
February 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit D - Second Michigan Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.