Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hello Living Developer Nostrand Llc, Hello Nostrand Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Aloe, Paul H., Curran, Francis M, Saponara, David Nicholas, Worms, Victor A., Zelman, Yitzchak, (total of 7) See All against 1580 Nostrand Mezz Llc, Madison Realty Capital Lp, represented by Bonneville, Michael James, Feuerstein, Jerold C, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Paul I Marx presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul I Marx Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
COMPLAINT
Date: August 17, 2021SUMMONS
Date: August 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #006) Brooks Exhibit C - 2022-11-30 (DE 157) Am Compl Ex B - mezzanine loan agreement |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #006) Brooks Exhibit B - 2022-11-30 (DE 156) Am Compl Ex A - mezzanine promissory note |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #006) Brooks Exhibit D - 2022-11-30 (DE 158) Am Compl Ex C - ownership pledge |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #006) Brooks Exhibit G - 2021-10-25 (DE 058) Order |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #006) Brooks Exhibit E - 2022-11-30 (DE 159) Am Compl Ex D - notice of sale |
||
March 08, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #006) Affirmation of Jeffrey D. Brooks in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint |
||
March 08, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #006) Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint |
||
March 08, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #006) Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006) Brooks Exhibit A - 2022-11-30 (DE 155) Amended Complaint |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #006) Brooks Exhibit H - 2022-09-08 (DE 084) Francis M. Curran Affirmation in Opposition to OTSC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.