Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jamila E Samuel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hymowitz, Steven R, against Spencer T Warnock, Suzanne C Stephans, represented by Maciejunes, Nicole Marie, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Paul I Marx presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul I Marx Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 16, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: September 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 23, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
November 30, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
November 28, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Expert Witness Disclosure Ortho IME Dr. Ronald Snyder |
||
October 24, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Supplemental Notice for Discovery and Inspection dated 10-11-22 |
||
June 02, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice for Discovery and Inspection Redacted per 22 NYCRR Response to Notice for Discovery and Inspection Redacted |
||
April 18, 2022 |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention |
||
April 18, 2022 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference |
||
October 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 30, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Supplemental Notice for Discovery and Inspection dated 9-27-21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.