Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lisa Seiff, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Brown, Kevin C., Kass, Risa K., against Matthew Seiff, represented by Thorsen, Eric O, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Christie D'Alessio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristie D'Alessio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 | TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS (REQUEST TO SO ORDER) | ||
March 20, 2023 | TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED | ||
March 20, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
March 06, 2023 | TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED | ||
March 02, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
March 02, 2023 | TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS (REQUEST TO SO ORDER) | ||
February 27, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 14, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
February 10, 2023 | TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED | ||
February 06, 2023 | ORDER (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.