Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, As Trustee For The Holders Of The First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-Ff15 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-Ff15, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Patel, Rajan, against Edward Filemyr, Elk Associates Funding Corporation, John Does #1-5, Mercer Square, L.L.C., Sylvester Affan, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions544 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Case Cycle Time997 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 24, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 01, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 01, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service as to Notice of Entry |
||
September 23, 2014 | Notice of Entry | ||
September 22, 2014 |
JUDGMENT (Motion #001) JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 22, 2014 |
||
September 03, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Notice of Settlement |
||
September 03, 2014 | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT | ||
July 24, 2013 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Plaintiff's letter response to SBA's request for stay nunc pro tunc |
||
July 24, 2013 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RE: Plaintiff's letter response to SBA's request for stay |
||
July 22, 2013 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 22, 2013 |
NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT of Receiver for Elk Associates Funding Corp. and STAY |
||
June 26, 2013 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Presented pursuant to 6-24-13 SFO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.