Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gindi, Michael Eddie, Guarneri, Christina A, Schwalb, Jonathan Chaim, Spinelli, Victor, Tabakin, Gregg P, (total of 5) See All against Denna Dee, Jack Lambert, Martin Nee, Mountainview East Iii Condominium-Bd Mgrs, Pamela Nee Est Of, (total of 6) See All represented by Selig, Benjamin Edward, Smith, Alden B, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1077 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time1125 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 08, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 30, 2011JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 28, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2015 | Hearing |
Settled Robert M. Berliner (Trial) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
May 19, 2015 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
May 06, 2015 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
February 04, 2015 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 28, 2015 |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #002) JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 28, 2015 |
||
January 28, 2015 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
January 16, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Robert M. Berliner (Mtn) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
December 11, 2014 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 11, 2014 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 11, 2014 | AFFIRMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.