Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of New York, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kaplan, Francine S, against Joyce Simons, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions347 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time484 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 29, 2011SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: April 25, 2013SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: April 26, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 25, 2013 | |
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on December 10, 2012 | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.