Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Indenture Trustee For American Home Mortgage Investment Trust 2005-1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against Cach, Llc, Daimlerchrysler Financial Services Americas, Llc, Impac Funding Corp., Jeffrey Freundlich A K A Jeffrey H. Freundlich, Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, (total of 9) See All represented by Kahn, Paul Bruce, Zebrowski, Kathleen A, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions320 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time320 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 16, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2012NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 11, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2012RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 14, 2012NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 24, 2012NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 22, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 16, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 30, 2011AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2012AFFIRMATION
Date: February 10, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 16, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 16, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 16, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: March 12, 2013AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 16, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 16, 2012DECISION ON MOTION -SETTLE ORD / JGMT Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 14, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 12, 2012NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 10, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 10, 2012JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 14, 2012NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 16, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: August 14, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2012SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2011AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2012ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 16, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2013 |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE Referee's Report of Sale |
||
November 14, 2012 |
DECISION ON MOTION -SETTLE ORD / JGMT (Motion #002) DECISION ON MOTION -SETTLE ORD / JGMT entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 14, 2012 |
||
November 14, 2012 |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #002) JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 14, 2012 |
||
November 08, 2012 | Hearing |
Settled Robert M. Berliner (Trial) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
November 02, 2012 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Robert M. Berliner (Mtn) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
October 16, 2012 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT |
||
October 16, 2012 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) A |
||
October 16, 2012 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) B |
||
October 16, 2012 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) E |
||
October 16, 2012 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.