Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Wallace, Lisa L, against Joseph English, Kristy English, Midland Funding Llc D B A In New York As Midland Funding Of Delaware Llc, represented by Joyce, Dwight D, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 10, 2012SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 28, 2011EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 31, 2013EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 31, 2013EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 31, 2013AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2013AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2012JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: November 07, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 31, 2013DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 02, 2014AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: June 06, 2014EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: June 06, 2014AFFIRMATION
Date: June 06, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: June 06, 2014AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 06, 2014AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: June 06, 2014NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 04, 2015NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 13, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 09, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 07, 2014FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: April 27, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 17, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2012NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 28, 2011ANSWER
Date: November 14, 2012RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 16, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2012NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 31, 2013EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 31, 2013EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 31, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2015 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
March 13, 2015 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 04, 2015 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Sale |
||
November 07, 2014 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 07, 2014 | ||
November 07, 2014 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
June 09, 2014 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 06, 2014 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
June 06, 2014 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
June 06, 2014 | AFFIRMATION | ||
June 06, 2014 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.