Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Elizabeth Ford, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Akerib, David, Lissauer, Lawrence D, against Corsa Management Corporation, Mayfair Realty Apts, L.L.C., represented by Bernheimer, Jason M, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Thomas Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time202 days |
STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 06, 2012RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 20, 2012PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: March 20, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 17, 2012 |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Reuest for PC |
|
March 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation for caption to reflect defendant's correct name |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Verified Answer and Demands |
|
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Secured |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Secured |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Secured |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Secured |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.