Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Michael Buxbaum, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Adam Kurland, represented by Kurland, Adam K, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Sherri L Eisenpress presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSherri L Eisenpress Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Tort) |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 26, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 29, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - . Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 20, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 19, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: July 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 20, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - . (Motion #001) Decision and Order |
||
October 19, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 19, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
July 29, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Decision and Order |
||
July 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Letter |
||
July 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint |
||
July 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) NYSCEF search |
||
July 29, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.