Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Cohen, David A, Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Roselor Saint-German, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 19, 2011 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions226 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time1477 days |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 04, 2016JUDGMENT
Date: August 01, 2012SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 02, 2016SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - PARTIAL
Date: August 22, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2011STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 03, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 02, 2016 | |
January 02, 2016 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - PARTIAL BY SHERIFFS EXECUTION |
|
August 01, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 01, 2012 | |
August 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) SUPPLEMENTAL AMENDED SUMMONS |
|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT C450238 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.