Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cynthia Garnett Adm, Thelma Perez Deceased, By And Through, Cynthia Garnett, As Proposed Administrator Of The Estate Of Thelma Perez,, Thelma Perez Est Of, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Johnson, Ann R., Lissauer, Lawrence D, against Assisted Living At Northern Riverview, Assisted Living At Northern Riverview Inc-Dba, Assisted Living At Northern Riverview, Inc. D B A Assisted Living At Northern Riverview, John And Or Jane Doe, represented by Corley, Elizabeth Ann, Lang, Kathryn Mary, Semlies, Lori Rosen, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas P Zugibe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas P Zugibe Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Assisted Living Facility) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 22, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 22, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Adjournment request on consent |
||
June 08, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 23, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 17, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: responses to various demands / good faith effort to resolve discovery issues |
||
May 17, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
May 02, 2023 | TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED | ||
May 01, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Auth |
||
May 01, 2023 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Certified Transcript of court proceeding held on April 13, 2023 to be So Ordered by Judge Zugibe |
||
April 11, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
April 11, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Notice to Admit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.