Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Cohen, David A, Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Mark C Weiner, Mark C Weiner Pc, represented by Weiner, Mark Charles, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2011 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1561 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: November 25, 2013ANSWER
Date: January 17, 2012ANSWER
Date: January 17, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 02, 2014 |
|
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | |
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | |
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - D-F (Motion #001) | |
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.