Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Howard Fox, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Burger, Eileen M, against Evoi Productions, Evomed Imaging Llc-Dba, Evomed Imaging Llc D B A Evoi Productions, Evo Med Imaging Productions Llc-Dba, Evo Med Imaging Productions Llc D B A Evoi Productions, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 22, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: May 09, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 11, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order and Judgment |
||
May 09, 2022 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 09, 2022 | ||
May 09, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 05, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
April 27, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 22, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 25, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 25, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 17, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.