Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Byron Mondragon, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kantrowitz, Barry S, against Dennis G. Bazazian, Patrick D. Bazazian, represented by Schoenberg, Richard B, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Gerald E Loehr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald E Loehr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2011 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time483 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 09, 2012ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: August 20, 2012ANSWER
Date: February 20, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2013 | Hearing |
Gerald E. Loehr TRC (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
March 26, 2013 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 26, 2013 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 26, 2013 | Hearing |
Adjourned Gerald E. Loehr TRC (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
February 21, 2013 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance with Affidavit of Service |
||
February 05, 2013 | Hearing |
Adjourned Gerald E. Loehr CONF (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
February 05, 2013 | Hearing |
Adjourned Linda S. Jamieson Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
December 18, 2012 | Hearing |
Adjourned Linda S. Jamieson TRC (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Jamieson, Hon. Linda S. |
|
October 10, 2012 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) Proposed Preliminary Conference Order |
||
October 09, 2012 | Hearing |
Held Linda S. Jamieson Supreme Trial, PLC (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Jamieson, Hon. Linda S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.