Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Osj Of Nanuet Ny, Llc, Osj Of Nanuet Ny Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Coleman, Daniel Raymond, Mc Namara, Mark Ryan, against Clarkstown Assessor, Clarkstown Board Of Assessment Review, Clarkstown Town Of, Clarkstown Town Of-Bd Of Assessment, Town Of Clarkstown, Ny, (total of 5) See All represented by Schofield, Paul K, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Amy Puerto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmy Puerto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 21, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 15, 2023NOTICE
Date: September 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 13, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 15, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 15, 2023 | NOTICE | ||
August 08, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 23, 2022 | NOTICE | ||
August 05, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Personal Service |
||
August 05, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service by Mail |
||
July 21, 2021 | PETITION | ||
July 21, 2021 | NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.