Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ashley, Llc, Ashley Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Mccarron, Lawrence Bernard, against Clarkstown Town Of, represented by Schofield, Paul K, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Paul I Marx presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul I Marx Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 21, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: March 13, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 13, 2023 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
March 13, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 22, 2022 | NOTICE | ||
August 09, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 03, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 21, 2021 | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.