Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Morris, Scott A, against Mary Hogan A K A Mary Peterson, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Victor J Alfieri presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictor J Alfieri Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2011 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedJune 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1162 days |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 11, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | |
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice of Court Conference and proof of service for the 10/29/2014 conference. |
|
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | |
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.