Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gemini Hyundai Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Smith, Alden B, against Guissepi Bueti A K A Joseph Bueti, Hyundai Of Rockland Llc, represented by Feerick, Donald J, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Victor J Alfieri presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictor J Alfieri Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2011 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time435 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: January 26, 2012ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER OTHER ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on February 22, 2013 |
|
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service of Not of Set and Prop Order |
|
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER Not of Settlement and Proposed Order |
|
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Svc on Feerick OTSC only |
|
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Svc on Gemini OTSC with AFF |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER OTHER ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on October 18, 2012 - Order to Show Cause |
|
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims |
|
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter re incorrect filing of Doc. #35 |
|
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal and Request for Appellate Division Intervention | |
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service of Notice of Appeal and RADI statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.