Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Bank Of New York, As Trustee For The Certificateholders Of Cwmbs, Inc., Chl Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2006-21 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-21, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Druckman, Stuart L, Perciballi, Nicholas E, against Isabel Ballesteros A K A Isabel Pepper, John Ballesteros, John Doe 1 To John Doe 25, National City Bank, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Victor J Alfieri presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictor J Alfieri Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2011 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1273 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 30, 2011STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 15, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | |
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT |
|
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of svce/isabgel ballesteros aka isabel pepper |
|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of svce/lawrence gall, pnc bank officer |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING e-file authorization |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of svce/john ballesteros |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.