Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rc Department Of Finance-Commissioner, Rockland County, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Feiden, Larraine S, Humbach, Thomas Edward, against George Darden, represented by Stepanovich, John George, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Thomas Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time853 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 04, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 12, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 04, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2018 | Hearing |
Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) CC (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
December 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) CC (9:30AM) (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
September 08, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Thomas E. Walsh (Motions) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.