Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rc Department Of Finance-Commissioner, Rockland County, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Feiden, Larraine S, Humbach, Thomas Edward, against Bernard Jackson, represented by Lynch, Dennis E, Stepanovich, John George, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Thomas Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1088 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1088 days |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: August 11, 2017STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION
Date: November 29, 2016RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 27, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 11, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 21, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 04, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 04, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 26, 2015ANSWER
Date: January 04, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 10, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 21, 2015JUDGMENT
Date: August 14, 2018NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT
Date: January 31, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: January 03, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 03, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 21, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 09, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 07, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 30, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 16, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 11, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002)
Date: August 04, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 04, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #002)
Date: August 04, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 04, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 04, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: July 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: July 13, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: July 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: July 13, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: July 13, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: July 12, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 12, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: July 12, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 12, 2017STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: June 08, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 09, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 17, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 08, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 23, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 13, 2018 | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
March 01, 2018 | Hearing |
Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) CC (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected* RADI form and Notice of Appeal |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
December 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) CC (9:30AM) (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.