Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Faye, Craig, against Gina Healy, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Gerald E Loehr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald E Loehr Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2015 |
CategoryConsumer Credit (Card) Transaction Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time762 days |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 21, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION AFF OF MAILING |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) DISCONTINUANCE |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Aff of Mailing |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) NoE |
|
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #001) Notice of Motion |
|
September 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Gerald E. Loehr
Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
June 09, 2017 | Motion |
Judgment - Default (Motion #001) Decided: 09/21/2017Granted Before Justice: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. Answer demanded: No Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
June 09, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Gerald E. Loehr Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) NoM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.