Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Aaron D Schechter, Abraham Hoffman, Abraham Kacenberg, Abraham Pearl Friedman, Aharon Berkowitz, (total of 46) See All filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Karben, Ryan S, against Spring Valley Village Of, Spring Valley Village Of-Assessor, Spring Valley Village Of Board Of Assessment Review, represented by Lynch, Dennis E, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2015 |
CategoryTax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time844 days |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: September 25, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 16, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
November 22, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 11/27/2017Granted Before Justice: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. Answer demanded: No Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
November 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Robert M. Berliner (Mtn) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | |
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
June 07, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled Robert M. Berliner (Trial) CC (9:15 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
March 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Robert M. Berliner (Trial) Supreme Trial, CC (9:15 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.