Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nickolson Francois, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Linder, Mark, against Leo G Pamphile, Lucien J Phamphile, represented by Debellis, Julio, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Thomas Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time496 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 29, 2019ANSWER
Date: September 14, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 07, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 14, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 19, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
December 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) SETTLED (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B photos |
|
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A photos and estimates |
|
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.