Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Berkeley College, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Kenneth Boykin, represented by Schulman, Julian A, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Gerald E Loehr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald E Loehr Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2015 |
CategoryConsumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time493 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: November 17, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: November 16, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 13, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
December 12, 2016 | Hearing |
David S. Zuckerman DISCONTINUED (Conversion) Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
December 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Gerald E. Loehr Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) 1108192 - Boykin - Stipulation of Settlement |
|
November 18, 2016 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #001) Decided: 12/07/2016Withdrawn Before Justice: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. Answer demanded: No Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
November 18, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Gerald E. Loehr Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) 1108192 - Reply Affirmation |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) 1108192 - Affidavit of Service |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) 1108192 - Ex. 1 - Application for Admission |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.