Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na-Tr, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against Ana Duran, Christian Urena, Christopher Urena, Edina Urena Delacruze, Jennifer Urena, (total of 10) See All represented by Lauterbach, Richard S, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Thomas Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions691 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time748 days |
COMPLAINT
Date: July 30, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 16, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) STATUS SMF (9:30AM) (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Foreclosure Action Surplus Monies Form | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE Referee's Report of Sale, Statement of Referee, Assignment of Bid, Affidavit of Publication |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM Terms of Sale, Memorandum of Sale |
|
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 16, 2017 | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | |
August 04, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Thomas E. Walsh (Motions) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
July 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) CONTROL (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.