Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, Watts, Valerie Elizabeth, against Naftali M Niman, represented by Kolber, Allen A, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2015 |
CategoryConsumer Credit (Card) Transaction Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions160 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time684 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 28, 2015JUDGMENT
Date: May 23, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2017ORDER - NO OPPOSITION SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 20, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 05, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 30, 2015ANSWER
Date: December 30, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 09, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 23, 2017 | |
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION non military affirmation |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION statute of limitations |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Redacted |
|
May 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Discontinued Robert M. Berliner (Trial) Supreme Trial, CONTROL (Conversion) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NO OPPOSITION SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION (Motion #001) Order |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order with Notice of Entry |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
March 07, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Robert M. Berliner (Trial) CONTROL (Conversion) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.