Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against Arshad M Qazi, Arshad Qazi Aka, Capital One Bank, Discover Bank, Isabel L Becker-Referee, (total of 10) See All represented by Becker, Isabel L, Gary, Charles Edward, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions239 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time239 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 23, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 01, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2018 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
November 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Robert M. Berliner (Mtn) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
October 17, 2018 | Motion |
Vacate/Strike - Note of Issue/Jury Demand/From Trial Calendar (Motion #001) Decided: 12/04/2018Granted Before Justice: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. Answer demanded: No Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
October 16, 2018 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) MOTION |
||
October 16, 2018 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) ORDER TO VACATE JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND DISCONTINUE ACTION |
||
October 16, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) EXHIBIT A |
||
October 16, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION |
||
October 16, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AOS |
||
January 03, 2018 | Hearing |
Discontinued Robert M. Berliner (Trial) Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
January 02, 2018 | Hearing |
Stay Lifted Robert M. Berliner (Trial) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.