Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Vera Parker, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Giuffra, Thomas P, Giuffra, Thomas Peter, against Beckerle Lumber Supply Co Inc, Matthew Beckerle, represented by Boydstun, Robert L, Goodovitch, Paul Ian, Mchugh, Keith Robert, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions635 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time967 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 26, 2018ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: April 04, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 11, 2018SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: November 28, 2017SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: December 14, 2017COPY OF SUBPOENA
Date: March 01, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 13, 2017SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: December 14, 2017SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: December 14, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 05, 2018SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: January 18, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 03, 2018SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: December 14, 2017STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: April 21, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 31, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 23, 2016STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: May 19, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 21, 2016ANSWER
Date: September 14, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 28, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 19, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 09, 2015STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: May 20, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2018 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 02, 2018 | Hearing |
Settled Robert M. Berliner (Trial) JS (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
March 01, 2018 | COPY OF SUBPOENA | ||
February 28, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned Robert M. Berliner (Trial) CIT (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
February 14, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned Robert M. Berliner (Trial) SETT CONF (10:00 A.M, .) (Conversion) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
February 05, 2018 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 30, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned Robert M. Berliner (Trial) STATUS (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
January 29, 2018 | Hearing |
Trial Assignment Part TRIAL (9:30 A.M.), RMB S CASE (Conversion) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
January 29, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned Robert M. Berliner (Trial) SETTLEMENT CONF (9:3, 0 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
January 29, 2018 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.