Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lynette Williams, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Linder, Mark, against Clarkstown Town Of, Hudson Transit Lines, represented by Garvey, Lawrence A, Hsu, John, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Victor J Alfieri presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictor J Alfieri Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time508 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: February 26, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 23, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 03, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 28, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 09, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: February 26, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 21, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 23, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 09, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 12, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 28, 2016ANSWER
Date: August 06, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 28, 2016STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 16, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled Victor J. Alfieri (Trials) S/C (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Alfieri Jr, Hon. Victor J. |
|
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER | |
June 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Victor J. Alfieri (Trials) CC (9:30 A.M.), ADV DEF S 6/10 LTR (Conversion) Judge: Alfieri Jr, Hon. Victor J. |
|
March 16, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Victor J. Alfieri (Motions) Judge: Alfieri Jr, Hon. Victor J. |
|
March 16, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Victor J. Alfieri (Trials) Supreme Initial (first time on), PLC (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Alfieri Jr, Hon. Victor J. |
|
March 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Victor J. Alfieri (Motions) Judge: Alfieri Jr, Hon. Victor J. |
|
March 04, 2016 | Motion |
Discovery (Motion #001) Decided: 03/04/2016Decided Before Justice: Alfieri Jr, Hon. Victor J. Answer demanded: No Judge: Alfieri Jr, Hon. Victor J. |
|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | |
March 02, 2016 | Motion |
Dismiss (Motion #002) Decided: 03/16/2016Decided Before Justice: Alfieri Jr, Hon. Victor J. Answer demanded: No Judge: Alfieri Jr, Hon. Victor J. |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.