Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jocelyn Decrescenzo, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Crown, Valerie J, Crown, Valerie J., against Ira Gable Aka, Ira J Gable Jr Aka, Jay J Gable Jr, Victoria Gable, represented by Bookwalter, Deborah J, Curcio, Craig P, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Trial Assignment Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrial Assignment Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 07, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time832 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: August 17, 2016SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: October 06, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 10, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Arbitration |
|
October 16, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled Trial Assignment Part CONF (9:30 A.M.), GEL S CASE (Conversion) Judge: Part - (Rockland), Trial Assignment |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED Helen Hayes Hospital |
|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | |
September 13, 2017 | Hearing |
Gerald E. Loehr J/S (10:00 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
September 13, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Trial Assignment Part Judge: Part - (Rockland), Trial Assignment |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.