Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Carol Hahn, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Neimark, Marshall A, Neimark, Marshall Adam, against Douglas P Gruffi, Douglas P Gruffi Dds Llc, represented by Caiazzo, Christopher C, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Gerald E Loehr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald E Loehr Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2015 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time401 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 13, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 24, 2015ANSWER
Date: August 05, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | |
August 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Gerald E. Loehr SETTLED (Conversion) Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter advising that matter settled |
|
June 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Gerald E. Loehr TRC/NOI (10:00 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter advising of status of discovery |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Designation and Discovery Stipulation and Order |
|
January 06, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Gerald E. Loehr Supreme Initial (first time on), PLC (10:00 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE PLEAD - NOTICE OF MEDICAL - DENTAL MALPRACTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.