Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Us Bank Trust Na-Tr, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brennan, Jennifer R., Cascino, Margaret Jaffe, Lawrence, Peter Adel, Rumi, Fares Ahmad, Scali, Anthony Paul, (total of 7) See All against Daniel Rivera Exr Aka, Daniel S Rivera Exr, Mary K Mulholland Est Of, State Tax Commission, Usa Internal Revenue Service, (total of 5) See All represented by Bedell, Benjamin Berns, Dorfman, Burton I, Legal Aid Society At Rockland County, Inc., Legal Aid Society Of Rockland County, Inc., Richmond, Susan Mills, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Rolf Thorsen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRolf Thorsen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 05, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 06, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | Notice of Sale | ||
October 26, 2022 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
July 29, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 29, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 25, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 25, 2022 | ||
July 14, 2022 |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE *Corrected* Consent Judgement of Foreclosure and Sale with Bill of Sale and Schedule A |
||
April 28, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 03, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
January 03, 2022 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
January 03, 2022 | BILL OF COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.